This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/16/2017 at 12:47:31 (UTC).

STOREY VS. SANTOS

Case Summary

On 02/19/2014 STOREY filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against SANTOS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0267

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARGUERITTE LAMBERT STOREY

1579 West Street

Concord, CA 94521

Defendants

ALFORD B SANTOS MD

PETER H ROWE MD

CELSO F TABORGA MD

DAVID SCHIFF MD

JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER-CONCORD

LEE C SAMSON

WINDSOR ROSEWOOD CARE CENTER, LLC

ALFORT B SANTOS, M.D.

JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MINTZ, KEVIN R

1970 Broadway, Ste 1150

Oakland, CA 94612

DAHL, SONJA M

201 North Civic Drive Suite 239

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GIOVANNIELLO, ALEXANDER F

1 Pointe Drive Suite 300

Brea, CA 92821

SPARKS, KAREN A

2300 Contra Costa Blvd Suite 350

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2014
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARGUERITTE STOREY FILED BY JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS OF AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PETER H ROWE MD, ALFORT B SANTOS, M.D.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARGUERITTE STOREY FILED BY PETER H ROWE MD, ALFORT B SANTOS, M.D.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CELSO F TABORGA MD; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARGUERITTE STOREY FILED BY CELSO F TABORGA MD; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND MTN TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2014
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE PHONE NO OF PARTY MARGUERITTE LAMBERT STOREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • RECVD LETTER FROM MARGUERITTE STOREY INFORMING TH E INCORRECT NO ON THE PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2014 OF MARGUERITTE STOREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2014 OF MARGUERITTE STOREY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/25/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/08/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.