This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:36:17 (UTC).

STOPFORTH VS RODEO SANITARY

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 STOPFORTH filed an Other lawsuit against RODEO SANITARY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1582

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERT STOPFORTH

DENICE STOPFORTH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RODEO SANITARY DISTRICT

D'ARCY & HARTY CONSTRUCTION, INC

GREG JACOBS ENGINEERS

Cross Defendant

MOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOSTICK, BRADLEY L

1300 Clay Street Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCAS, TIMOTHY D

9191 Towne Centre Drive Suite 190

San Diego, CA 92122

SCHNEIDER, WILLIAM P

P.O. Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164-0093

LEVY, DAVID M

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2017 OF ROBERT STOPFORTH AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY D'ARCY & HARTY CONSTRUCTION, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ROBERT STOPFORTH, DENICE STOPFORTH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CMC, NTC OFPOSTING JURY FEES TO ROBERT STOPFORTH, COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA, D'ARCY & HARTY CONSTRUCTION, INC, GREG JACOBS ENGINEERS ON 04/23/19 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF/TO POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODEO SANITARY DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: BAY AREA LEGA SUPPORT, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: RODEO SANITARY DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RODEO SANITARY DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 1/08/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2017 OF ROBERT STOPFORTH RE: BUSINESS D'ARCY & HARTY CONSTRUCTION, INC W/MAILING ON 11/16/17 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2017 OF ROBERT STOPFORTH FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/10/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/18/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY, DAVID M.