This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/12/2017 at 16:32:36 (UTC).

STEADFAST HILLTOP COMMONS VS. WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 STEADFAST HILLTOP COMMONS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0230

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NINDER K. GREWAL

Concord, CA 94520

Defendant

JAMANI ABASIZAID WILLIAMS

San Pablo, CA 94806

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREWAL, NINDER K

Kimball Tirey & St John Llp 2300 Clayton Road Suite 1350

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • JURY TRIAL WAS SET FOR 6/19/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE HEARING WAS SET FOR 6/16/17 AT 15:30 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • COUNTER MEMORANDUM TO SET JURY TRIAL FILED BY JAMANI ABASIZAID WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • SUBSEQUENT FEE WAIVER GRANTED AS TO JAMANI ABASIZAID WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF SUPPLEMENTAL FEES FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY JAMANI ABASIZAID WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - U.D. WAS SET FOR 6/06/17 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF NINDER GREWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF NINDER GREWAL AS TO DEF ENDANT JAMANI ABASIZAID WILLIAMS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO JAMANI ABASIZAID WILLIAMS IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION WAS SET FOR 4/25/17 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JAMANI ABASIZAID WILLIAMS (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF NINDER GREWAL BY JAMANI ABASIZAID WILLIAMS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 5/27/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF NINDER GREWAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.