Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 22:11:10 (UTC).

STATE OF CALIF VS. CLIFTON COURT LP

Case Summary

On 04/10/2012 STATE OF CALIF filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CLIFTON COURT LP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0844

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

KELLY DAL PORTO

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC CO.

RICHARD C THOMAS

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN & CLAIMINGINTEREST IN

CLIFTON COURT L.P.

ROBERT A DAL PORTO, SR

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

CONEY ISLAND FARMSINC

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE CO.

DAVID DAL PORTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FESER JR, JOHN M

13001 I Street Suite 125 Po Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 42550

Defendant Attorneys

ALEGRIA, JR, CESAR V

P.O. Box 7442

San Francisco, CA 94120

NOMELLINI, DANTE J

235 East Weber Ave P.O. Box1461

Stockton, CA 95201

KEELING, THOMAS H

1818 Grand Canal Blvd, Ste. 4

Stockton, CA 95207

OKCU, NIKI B

525 Market Street 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2014
  • JURY TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 2 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 3 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA FILED BY PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA FILED BY PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON 1ST AMENDED EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA AS TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/12/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR PROOF OF SERVICE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2012
  • KELLY DAL PORTO ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • STATE OF CALIFORNIA IS EXEMPT FROM FILING FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/15/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • FIRM/ATTORNEY JOHN M FESER JR UPDATED USING FIRM CODE JMF13 TO CORRECT ADD PO BOX & FAX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 04/10/2012 OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/04/12 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED RE EMINENT DOMAIN. SUMMONS IS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Feser, Jr