Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/02/2017 at 01:19:54 (UTC).

STALEY VS WALNUT CREEK FORD

Case Summary

On 05/08/2012 STALEY filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against WALNUT CREEK FORD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3227

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

JACK STALEY

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Respondent

WALNUT CREEK FORD

1800 N. Main

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Interested Party

STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

LABOR COMMISIONER,STATE OF CA

1515 Clay Street Suite 801

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL WTH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 1 DAY(S); Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 8/20/12 AT 9:06 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • PLAINTIFF STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER ADDS ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • CHECK FOR AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DEFENDANT WALNUT CREEK FORD ADDS ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 5/23/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: INCOMPLETE NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO JACK STALEY IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JACK STALEY (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL ON ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALNUT CREEK FORD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER is a litigant