This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 10/25/2017 at 15:01:34 (UTC).

SRPS LP VS COOPERBANKS/BANKS

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 SRPS LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COOPERBANKS/BANKS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0971

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SRPS LP

Defendants

ALL OCCUPANTS

CYNTHIA COOPERBANKS

Antioch, CA 94509

MICHELLE BANKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS ROSALES & HARRIS

351 St. Mary Street

Pleasanton, CA 94566

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL CYNTHIA COOPERBANKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - UNCONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 09/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • COURT REPORTER NOT REQUESTED BY SRPS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • UD TRIAL SET FOR 9/26/17 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/25/2017 OF SRPS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY SRPS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/25/2017 OF SRPS LP AS TO DEFENDANT CYNTHIA COOPERBANKS WITH MAILING DATE OF 08/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/25/2017 OF SRPS LP AS TO DEFENDANT MICHELLE BANKS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/25/2017 OF SRPS LP FILED BY CYNTHIA COOPERBANKS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CYNTHIA COOPERBANKS (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO CYNTHIA COOPERBANKS IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 10/10/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/25/2017 OF SRPS LP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less