This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 16:37:38 (UTC).

SPENCER VS. SRA VENTURE

Case Summary

On 12/30/2016 SPENCER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SRA VENTURE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2468

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LATISHA SPENCER

Defendants

SRA VENTURE CORP

SRA VENTURE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSEN, ESQ, BRIAN L

530 Jackson Street 2 Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorney

MINIOZA, JOSEPH J

One Concord Center 2300 Clayton Rd, #350

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LATISHA SPENCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SRA VENTURE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: SRA VENTURE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • SRA VENTURE CORPORATION ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2016 OF LATISHA SPENCER, SRA VENTURE CORP IS REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2016 OF LATISHA SPENCER FILED BY SRA VENTURE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2016 OF LATISHA SPENCER RE: BUSINESS SRA VENTURE CORP W/MAILING ON 01/06/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 3/09/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/06/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2016 OF LATISHA SPENCER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/19/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.