Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 11/28/2016 at 15:25:08 (UTC).

SIERRA VS. HERNANDEZ/VAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 SIERRA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ/VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0940

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC.

Defendants

ELIZABETH VAZQUEZ

Antioch, CA 94509

GERARDO HERNANDEZ

Antioch, CA 94509

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT J. ROSSI (365169)JOHN WILLSIE (18263

1800 Willow Pass Ct

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2016
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2016 OF SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC. FILED AS TO DEFENDANT GERARDO HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2016 OF SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC. AGAINST DEFENDANT GERARDO HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • UD TRIAL SET FOR 10/04/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • COURT REPORTER IS NOT REQUESTED BY SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2016 OF SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC. AS TO DEFENDANT ELIZABETH VAZQUEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/10/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2016 OF SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC. AS TO DEFENDANT GERARDO HERNANDEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/09/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF DENIED WAIVER OF GERARDO HERNANDEZ SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2016
  • WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FOR GERARDO SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ELIZABETH VAZQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ELIZABETH VAZQUEZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GERARDO HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2016 OF SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC. FILED BY GERARDO HERNANDEZ, ELIZABETH VAZQUEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 10/24/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2016 OF SIERRA PACIFIC PROPERTIES INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less