This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/17/2017 at 15:10:26 (UTC).

SIERRA PACIFIC VS SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 SIERRA PACIFIC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0780

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIERRA PAFICIC PROPERTIES INC

Defendants

ALL OCCUPANTS

DESREY ABRAMS

JOSHLYN SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT J. ROSSI (365169)JOHN WILLSIE (18263

1800 Willow Pass Ct

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 08/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF SIERRA PAFICIC PROPERTIES INC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT JOSHLYN SMITH, DESREY ABRAMS, ALL OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF SIERRA PAFICIC PROPERTIES INC AGAINST DEFENDANT JOSHLYN SMITH, DESREY ABRAMS, ALL OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • ALL OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 07/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF SIERRA PAFICIC PROPERTIES INC AS TO DEFENDANT DESREY ABRAMS WITH MAILING DATE OF 07/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF SIERRA PAFICIC PROPERTIES INC AS TO DEFENDANT JOSHLYN SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 9/01/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2017 OF SIERRA PAFICIC PROPERTIES INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less