This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 02:27:49 (UTC).

SHERRY STEINMETZ VS DEREK STEINMENTS

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 SHERRY STEINMETZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEREK STEINMENTS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1579

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHERRY STEINMETZ

Danville, CA 94506

Respondent

DEREK STEINMETZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • STIPULATION & ORDER DIVISION OF PROPERTY, CUSTODY, VISITATION, C/S , S FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DIVISION OF PROPERTY FROM SHERRY STEINMETZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 04/02/2018 OF SHERRY STEINMETZ AS TO DEREK STEINMETZ (SERVED ON 04/11/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/30/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 4/03/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 04/02/2018 OF SHERRY STEINMETZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/02/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/01/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/02/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.