This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:35:27 (UTC).

SHELL WESTERN VS WIGLEY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 SHELL WESTERN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WIGLEY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1460

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Cross Defendants

SHELL WESTERN STATES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

VIC REMORINI

LARRY CHAPMAN

JOHNNY CHATMAN

FRED CRUM

Defendant, Appellant and Cross Plaintiff

LARRY WIGLEY

Not Classified By Court

BROOKANN WIGLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorney

LEADER-PICONE, MALCOLM

1970 Broadway Suite 1030

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant, Appellant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FEDER, DANIEL

332 Pine Street Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94104

KUHNER, CHRIS D

1970 Broadway Suite 225

Oakland, CA 94612

Not Classified By Court Attorney

STERNBERG, DAVID M.

540 Lennon Lane

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER OF SALE OF 723 ULFINIAN WAY, MARTINEZ, CALIFORNIA 94553 FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: 1/2 INTEREST OF DWELLING SET BY COURT; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • JUDGMENT CREDITORS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO AMENDED APPL FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: DECL OF STERNBRG, BRIEF RE 3RD PARTY CLAIMANT WIGL YS CLAIM ON 030119 SEE SVC LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID M. STERNBERG FILED RE: ISO CLAIM TO ONE HALF INTERST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • BRIEF RE: 3RD PARTY CLAIMANT BROOKANN WIGLEYS CLAIM TO HER ONE-HALF INTEREST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • JUDGMENT CREDITORS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ISO AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING WAS SET FOR 3/22/19 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • HEARING ON AMENDED APP FOR ORDER OF SALE OF DWELLING ( FILED 5/11/18 BY PLAINTIFF); Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
261 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING TRO AND STAY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY SHELL WESTERN STATES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DECLARATION OF LARRY WIGLEY FILED RE: IN OPPO TO TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/31/2014 OF SHELL WESTERN STATES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 12/17/14 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/06/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less