This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/24/2018 at 12:26:40 (UTC).

SHEILA THOMPSON VS DENNIS THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 07/23/2018 SHEILA THOMPSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DENNIS THOMPSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3311

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHEILA THOMPSON

Respondent

DENNIS THOMPSON

Others

USW SAVINGS PROGRAM USS-POSCO INDUSTRIES 40

STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FISHEL, JAMES

1375 Locust Street Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR JOINDER OF EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST AND ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • PLEADING ON JOINDER - EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN - SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • PLEADING ON JOINDER - EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN - SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/23/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 1/21/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 7/24/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR JOINDER OF EMPLOYEE PENSION BENEFIT PLAN USW SAVINGS PROGRAMUSS-POSCO INDUSTRIES 40 AND ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 07/23/2018 OF SHEILA THOMPSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/22/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 1/22/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEELWORKERS PENSION TRUST is a litigant