This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/26/2017 at 12:09:23 (UTC).

SHEFAA AHMED VS ADEL MOHAMMED

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 SHEFAA AHMED filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ADEL MOHAMMED. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1058

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHEFAA AHMED SAEED AHMED

Respondent

ADEL KASEEM ALI MOHAMMED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JACOBVITZ, SARA

1025 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94801

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: 2336 JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY SHEFAA AHMED SAEED AHMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO ADEL KASEEM ALI MOHAMMED FILED. DATE COPY MAILED BY CLERK TO RESPONDENT 041117.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/03/2017 OF SHEFAA AHMED AGAINST ADEL KASEEM ALI MOHAMMED BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED BY SHEFAA AHMED SAEED AHMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PROOF OF MAIL SERVICE OF AMENDED UCCJEA WITH ATTACHMENTS ON ADEL KASEEM ALI MOHAMMED FILED. SERVED ON 04/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY SHEFAA AHMED SAEED AHMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/03/2017 OF SHEFAA AHMED AS TO ADEL KASEEM ALI MOHAMMED (SERVED ON 03/09/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • --RELATED CASE NUMBER IS: D14-02815 & F15-01590

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/05/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/30/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/02/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/03/2017 OF SHEFAA AHMED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SHEFAA AHMED SAEED AHMED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO SHEFAA AHMED SAEED AHMED IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less