This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 12:01:58 (UTC).

SHARON CASEY CASSELL VS MICHEAL WILLARD NORRIS

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 SHARON CASEY CASSELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MICHEAL WILLARD NORRIS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2411

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHARON CASEY CASSELL

Respondent

MICHAEL WILLARD NORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHANG, GRACE LEE

301 E Colorado Blvd Suite 325

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/30/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/28/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/03/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/02/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 5/31/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 06/01/2018 OF SHARON CASSELL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.