This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/01/2020 at 12:15:49 (UTC).

SHANNON RUTHERFORD VS SHAWN RUTHERFORD

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 SHANNON RUTHERFORD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SHAWN RUTHERFORD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5653

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHANNON RUTHERFORD

Danville, CA 94526

Respondent

SHAWN RUTHERFORD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2024
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/31/2019 OF SHANNON RUTHERFORD AS TO SHAWN RUTHERFORD (SERVED ON 12/31/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/31/2019 OF SHANNON RUTHERFORD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/30/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/29/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/30/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/28/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 12/30/24 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.