This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/28/2017 at 12:07:26 (UTC).

SHANISE WILSON-COOPER VS UHURU COOPER

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 SHANISE WILSON-COOPER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against UHURU COOPER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1167

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHANISE WILSON-COOPER

Antioch, CA 94509

Respondent

UHURU COOPER

Pinole, CA 94564

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • CHECK FOR RESPONDENTS FIRST FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO UHURU COOPER IS DENIED; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • PLACED ON CLERK`S CALENDAR FOR 4/28/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSO/NULLITY/LEGAL SEP OF UHURU COOPER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY UHURU COOPER (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY SHANISE WILSON-COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SHANISE WILSON-COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 03/07/2017 OF SHANISE WILSON-COOPER AS TO UHURU COOPER (SERVED ON 03/10/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/04/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/07/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/05/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/07/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 03/07/2017 OF SHANISE WILSON-COOPER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/05/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 24

    Read MoreRead Less