Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/31/2017 at 16:48:45 (UTC).

SF PATROL SPECIAL OFFICERS VS CITY/CNTY OF SF

Case Summary

On 07/27/2012 SF PATROL SPECIAL OFFICERS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CITY/CNTY OF SF. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1656

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALAN BYARD

ROBET L BURNS

CALVIN C WILEY

JOHN J ANDREWS

SCOTT HART

TODD HART

SAMUEL J REYES SR

ROBERT L BURNS

Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OFSAN FRANCISCO, A PUBLIC

SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT, A PUBLIC

GERALD DARCY SGT

MARTIN OHALLORAN

UEGEN GELEANO SGT

JOHN BRAGAGNOLO SGT

JESUS PENA SGT

MICHAEL SIMMONS

PETER THOSHINSKY SGT

JOHN VAN KOSS

THOMAS CUNNANE

RANDY LY

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKONDI, DANIEL A

870 Market St., Suite 1157

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

SHEN, ANDREW

1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Plac

San Francisco, CA 94102-4682

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2013
  • CHECK FOR TRANSMITTAL LETTER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • RECEIPT OF RECORD ON TRANSFER RECEIVED. ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER CGC-13-528788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF TRANSMITTAL SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 4/12/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT V IA CERT MAIL NO 70100290000165301971

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • ON 01/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 17 TO 09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2012
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE NAME - SPELLING OF PARTY JOHN VAN KOLL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE NAME - SPELLING OF PARTY ROBERT L BURNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/16/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 9/10/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/27/2012 OF ALAN BYARD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/27/2012 OF ALAN BYARD PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN FRANCISCO POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where City and County of San Francisco is a litigant