This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2017 at 04:47:05 (UTC).

SERAPIAO VS SHIH

Case Summary

On 07/22/2016 SERAPIAO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHIH. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0297

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PAULO ROBERTO BARBOSA SERAPIAO

Berkeley, CA 94705

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

TERESA SHIH

Brentwood, CA 94513

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2016
  • REFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2016
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/06/2016 OF PAULO BARBOSA SERAPIAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RELEAST OF PAYMENT IN TRUST FORWARDED WITH REQUEST FOR FUNDS TO FISCAL DEPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • JUDGMENT CREDITOR`S REQUEST FOR FUNDS FILED ON MONEY HELD IN TRUST AFTER PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT TO THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT MONIES PAID TO COURT THIS DATE BY TERESA SHIH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • RECEIPT FOR SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT MONIES PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • REQUEST TO PAY SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT TO THE COURT BY TERESA SHIH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/11/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/11/16

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/29/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR SUBPEONA DUCES TECUM BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 6/15/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/06/2016 OF PAULO BARBOSA SERAPIAO SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: TERESA SHIH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less