Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 08:38:48 (UTC).

SEQUOIA EQUITIES VS. MERCADO

Case Summary

On 05/24/2012 SEQUOIA EQUITIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MERCADO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0404

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEQUOIA EQUITIES

Defendant

MONIQUE MERCADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

4261 Norwalk Drive #107

San Jose, CA 95129

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA RETURNED FULLY-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 08/14/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2012 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2012 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES FILED AS TO DEFENDANT MONIQUE MERCADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2012 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES AGAINST DEFENDANT MONIQUE MERCADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2012 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES AS TO DEF ENDANT MONIQUE MERCADO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 7/11/12 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2012 OF SEQUOIA EQUITIES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less