This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 23:26:27 (UTC).

SCOTT VS. UBER

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 SCOTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0051

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIELLE SCOTT

TARA BOMAGAT

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ANDREA ROBERTS

RASIER-CA, LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES,INC.

RASIER-PA LLC

GREIG WATSON

RASIER-DC, LLC

RASIER, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RASIER-CA, LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES,INC.

GREIG WATSON

RASIER, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAUR, HARMANDEEP

1317 Oakdale Rd Ste 500

Modesto, CA 95355

PARSONS, NICOLE E

2440 Santa Clara Ave

Alameda, CA 94501

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SMITH, MICHAEL J.

555 12Th Street, Suite 1250

Oakland, CA 94607-4095

TYSON, ROBERT F

523 Fourth Street Suite 100

San Rafael, CA 94901

ROMERO, ROBERT J

One California Street 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TYSON, ROBERT F

523 Fourth Street Suite 100

San Rafael, CA 94901

ROMERO, ROBERT J

One California Street 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2017 OF UBER TECHNOLOGIES,INC. AS TO DEFENDANT ANDREA ROBERTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/17/2017 OF GREIG WATSON AS TO DEFENDANT ANDREA ROBERTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DANIELLE SCOTT, TARA BOMAGAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF DANIELLE SCOTT AS TO DEFENDANT ANDREA ROBERTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF DANIELLE SCOTT AS TO UBER TECHNOLOGIES,INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/31/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF DANIELLE SCOTT AS TO RASIER-CA, LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/31/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 3/17/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF DANIELLE SCOTT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/06/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/24/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.