This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2017 at 05:06:36 (UTC).

SCHAEFER VS SCHAEFER

Case Summary

On 06/13/2016 SCHAEFER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCHAEFER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0395

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAD SCHAEFER

Antioch, CA 94531

Defendant

SHEY SCHAEFER

Brentwood, CA 94513

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/13/2016 OF BRAD SCHAEFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • ORDER TO/FOR DENYING REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • CHECK FOR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS F ILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 9/06/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF LIEN (ATTACHMENT-ENFORCMENT OF JUDGMENT) RECEIVED FROM DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 07/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 07/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/13/2016 OF BRAD SCHAEFER AS TO DEFENDANT SHEY SCHAEFER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/13/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/25/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $4,400.00

    Read MoreRead Less