This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 10:58:50 (UTC).

SBITNEV VS MACY'S INC.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2012 SBITNEV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MACY'S INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0407

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREY V. SBITNEV

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendants

MACY'S, INC.

2710 Gateway Oaks Dr. Aos: Csc Lawyers Incorporating

Sacramento, CA 95833

MACY'S WEST STORES, INC.

2710 Gateway Oaks Dr Ste 150N Aos: Csc Lawyers Inc

Sacramento, CA 95833

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF ANDREY SBITNEV AS TO DEFENDANT MACY'S WEST STORES,INC. WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 08/08/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF ANDREY SBITNEV SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: MACY'S WEST STORES,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • MACY'S WEST STORES,INC. ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • (S.C.) 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF ANDREY SBITNEV FILED (AMENDING CONTENT WITHOUT ALTERING ORIGINAL FILING FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • RE: CHANGE IN HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 7/11/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/07/2012 OF ANDREY SBITNEV SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: MACY'S, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less