Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 14:12:56 (UTC).

SARWARY VS WESTER PACIFIC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2012 SARWARY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WESTER PACIFIC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0319

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RICKEY WELSH

MOHAMMED SARWARY

SEAN BIRCH

DEBBIE INGRAM

JORGE FERNANDEZ

ROBIN TRUNNELL

LESLIE STODDARD

ANA VALLADARES

GISELE THIERRY

ALVARO GARCIA

Cross Plaintiffs

GLORIA REDDING

WILLIAM MORALES

MELIDA SOLORZANO

LORI STENULSON

MARK LALIBERTE

ESMERALDA PRADO

SUZANNE MOOERS

CELINE SCHEIDE

JOLAYNE MARYMEE

GARY MCGINNIS

79 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

EDWARDS, LUCAS A

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

RYAN, LUKE P.

1810 State Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

HILLIER, ERIC R

1401 Willow Pass Road Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520

PETERSON, PATRICIA J

215 Lennon Lane Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

WELCH, STEPHEN B

P.O. Box 8035 2033 N. Main Street #800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT BY WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO ACT IN ACCORDANCE WITH REPRESENTATIONS; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
196 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/29/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/26/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/08/2012 OF MOHAMMED SARWARY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • MARTHA VAZQUEZ PATRANA, MELVILLE CLARKE, DONNA CLARKE ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • KARL BURKE, JOHN CALEGARI, LISAJOY CALEGARI, MARVIN CARTER, MARVIN CARTER, JUAN CASTILLO, HUA CHEN, JIENLIN CHEN, PAULA PEREZ CHERRY ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • IBRAHIM AL-HAJJAJ, RIMA ANABTAWI, GERARDO ALVAREZ, OLIVIA ALVAREZ, STUART BALAGOT, SOFIA ARTEAGA, SCOTT BENNET-NAVA, SONIA BENNET-NAVA, SEAN BIRCH ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON, PATRICIA J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILLIER, ERIC R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELCH, STEPHEN B.