This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/04/2017 at 12:03:26 (UTC).

SANDRA MORANDIN VS DANIEL MORANDIN

Case Summary

On 03/27/2017 SANDRA MORANDIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DANIEL MORANDIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1506

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDRA MORANDIN

Respondent

DANIEL P MORANDIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HICKEY, WILLIAM A

815 Court St Po Box 6

Martinez, CA 94553

Respondent Attorney

BURGER, FIONA Q.

2255 Contra Costa Blvd Suite 301

Pleasant Hill, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY DANIEL P MORANDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR FIRST FILING FEE FROM SANDRA MORANDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSO/NULLITY/LEGAL SEP OF DANIEL P MORANDIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • CHECK FOR FIRST PAPER FEE OR REQ FOR HRG FROM PETITIONER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • PLACED ON CLERK`S CALENDAR FOR 4/17/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO SANDRA MORANDIN IS DENIED; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/27/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/24/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/28/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SANDRA MORANDIN (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 03/27/2017 OF SANDRA MORANDIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/26/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/25/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): LAVANDER

    Read MoreRead Less