Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 03:37:39 (UTC).

SAINTLOUIS VS VEGA

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 SAINTLOUIS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VEGA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1234

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YVONNE SAINTLOUIS

FELIX SAINTLOUIS

Defendants

ALEXANDRO VEGA

Antioch, CA 94531

MARIA LETICIA VEGA

Antioch, CA 94531

JUAN J. VEGA

Antioch, CA 94531

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

FLORENTINE G. VEGA

Antioch, CA 94531

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOBIN, RICHARD

1011 "A" Street

Antioch, CA 94509

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • REFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE NOT DELIVERABLE/UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • ORDER TO/FOR THIRD REQUEST FOR STAY WAS DENIED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • INFORMED ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF THAT THIRD REQUEST FOR STAY WAS DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • SPOKE TO MARGIE AT HOBINS OFFICE RE THIRD PETITION FOR STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • THIRD PETITION FOR STAY SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • PETITION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY MARIA LETICIA VEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PETITION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY MARIA LETICIA VEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • SECOND REQUEST FOR STAY FILED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF FELIX SAINTLOUIS FILED BY JUAN J. VEGA, ALEXANDRO VEGA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JUAN J. VEGA (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF FELIX SAINTLOUIS FILED BY FLORENTINE G. VEGA, MARIA LETICIA VEGA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MARIA LETICIA VEGA (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY FLORENTINE G. VEGA (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 1/05/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2016 OF FELIX SAINTLOUIS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOBIN, RICHARD