This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 14:14:43 (UTC).

SAEPHAN VS. BLOMBERG/ PARADELA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2016 SAEPHAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLOMBERG/ PARADELA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0408

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALERIE V SAEPHAN

Rodeo, CA 94572

KAO K SAEPHAN

Rodeo, CA 94572

Defendants

GEORGE CASTRO PARADELA

Modesto, CA 95355

GLORIA BLOMBERG

San Jose, CA 95111

JOHN PARADELA

Pinole, CA 94564

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS SAD BEFORE HEARING - ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/22/2016 OF KAO SAEPHAN AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGE CASTRO PARADELA, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/31/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/22/2016 OF KAO SAEPHAN AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN PARADELA, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/12/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/22/2016 OF KAO SAEPHAN SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: GEORGE CASTRO PARADELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • UPDATE PARTY CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/22/2016 OF KAO SAEPHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/22/2016 OF KAO SAEPHAN SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: JOHN PARADELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/12/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.