This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 03/30/2022 at 12:07:19 (UTC).

RYAN BUOQUENOY VS THOMAS CAPALDO

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 RYAN BUOQUENOY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THOMAS CAPALDO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0441

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYAN BUOQUENOY

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendants

THOMAS CAPALDO

ANTHONY JASHUAN WILLS

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TURLINGTON, ALAN S

1415 Warner Ave Ste B

Tustin, CA 92780

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingDept: 21; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/09/2022 OF RYAN BUOQUENOY FILED TO NAME THE HERTZ CORPORATION AS DOE ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/28/22 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 5/13/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/09/2022 OF RYAN BUOQUENOY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TURLINGTON ALAN S.