Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/10/2016 at 13:11:07 (UTC).

RUSSO VS CUERAS

Case Summary

On 02/17/2009 RUSSO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CUERAS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0155

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENISE RUSSO

Discovery Bay, CA 94505

Defendants

LYDIA CUEVAS

Concord, CA 94521

WILFREDO CUEVAS

Concord, CA 94521

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2010
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - CONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 03/27/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • FILE TO 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 3/27/09 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • MEMO TO SET COURT TRIAL FILED BY DENISE RUSSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2009 OF DENISE RUSSO AS TO DEF ENDANT WILFREDO CUEVAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/17/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2009 OF DENISE RUSSO AS TO DEF ENDANT LYDIA CUEVAS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/17/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2009 OF DENISE RUSSO FILED BY WILFREDO CUEVAS, LYDIA CUEVAS. ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR COPIES OF COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS FROM DENISE RUSSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 4/08/09 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2009 OF DENISE RUSSO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • UPDATE PARTY LYDIA CUEVAS

    Read MoreRead Less