This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 14:36:05 (UTC).

RUSSELL VS. SAL'S CIGARETTE & SMOKE SHOP

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 RUSSELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAL'S CIGARETTE SMOKE SHOP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2179

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

FAITH RUSSELL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TOBACCO WORLD

SAL'S SMOKE SHOP

ABDO ALGHAZALI

SAL'S CIGARETTE & SMOKE SHOP

ADEL NAHSHAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON, ANDREW L

1901 Harrison Street Ste 1600

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SHALABY, ANDREW W

7525 Leviston Ave

El Cerrito, CA 94530

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2017 OF ABDO ALGHAZALI FILED BY FAITH RUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FAITH RUSSELL FILED BY SAL'S CIGARETTE & SMOKE SHOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FAITH RUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER ON DEFT SALS CIGARETTE AND SMOKE SHOPS DEM URRER TO PLTFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SAL'S CIGARETTE & SMOKE SHOP, TOBACCO WORLD, ABDO ALGHAZALI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • ORDER ON DEFENDANT SALS CIGARETTE AND SMOKE SHOPS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • ORDER ON DEMURRER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 1ST AMENDED SIGNED AND SENT TO RM 103 PROCESS, SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2016
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2016 OF FAITH RUSSELL AS TO ABDO ALGHAZALI WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/18/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2016 OF FAITH RUSSELL RE: BUSINESS TOBACCO WORLD W/MAILING ON 12/19/16 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 2/14/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/14/2016 OF FAITH RUSSELL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/29/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/18/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.