This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/03/2017 at 12:37:31 (UTC).

ROSEMARIE O. BARTOLO VS EDGAR I. BARTOLO

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 ROSEMARIE O BARTOLO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EDGAR I BARTOLO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5469

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSEMARIE O. BARTOLO

Antioch, CA 94531

Respondent

EDGAR I. BARTOLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MANNING, PETER D

1150 N. 1St Steet #120

San Jose, CA 95112

Respondent Attorney

RODIS, RODEL E

2429 Ocean Ave

San Francisco, CA 94127

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • UPDATE 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN OF ROSEMARIE BARTOLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • LEAVE OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN OF ROSEMARIE BARTOLO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • AND REQUEST FOR DWOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM NWOC TO DWOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR STIP/ORDER TO AMEND PETITION FROM ROSEMARIE O. BARTOLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • STIP AND ORDER TO ALLOW PETITIONER TO AMEND HER PETITION FROM A REQUEST FOR ANNULMENT OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR STIP AND ORDER TO ALLOW PTR TO AMEND PETITION FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSO/NULLITY/LEGAL SEP OF EDGAR I. BARTOLO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/30/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/28/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 2/27/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • (F.L.) ROSEMARIE O. BARTOLO SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ROSEMARIE O. BARTOLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • PETITION FOR NULLITY FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less