This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/27/2016 at 10:35:23 (UTC).

ROSAS VS. FONTAINE

Case Summary

On 02/16/2010 ROSAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FONTAINE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0101

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAFAEL H. ROJAS

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant

PENNY FONTAINE

San Ramon, CA 94583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2012
  • CERTIFIED COPY/COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/16/2010 OF RAFAEL ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • REFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • REQ SENT TO COURT FINANCIAL SVCS W/COPY PLACED IN FILE - INTERPRET ATTACHED ORDER ON PAGE 3, LINE(S) 1 TO MEAN: DRAW A WARRANT IN THE SUM OF $2,332.67, PAYABLE TO RAFAEL H. ROJAS AT ADDRESS: 34 CUESTA WAY WALNUT CREEK, CA 94597

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • JUDGMENT CREDITOR`S REQUEST FOR FUNDS FILED.JUDGMENT PAID TO THE COURT, FUNDS HELD IN TRUST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • RECEIPT FOR MISCELLANEOUS TRUST PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR SENT TO PLTF RE MONIES IN TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/16/2010 OF RAFAEL ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • RECEIPT FOR MISCELLANEOUS TRUST PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/08/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/16/2010 OF RAFAEL ROJAS AS TO DEFENDANT PENNY FONTAINE FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 02/25/10. FEE FOR SERVICE $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • UPDATE PARTY CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/16/2010 OF RAFAEL ROJAS RAFAEL H. ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 4/08/10 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BEIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $1,850.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less