Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 04:12:19 (UTC).

ROMERO VS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 04/04/2012 ROMERO filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2168

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANUEL W. ROMERO

Defendant

DANNY GOMEZ

Assignees

MANUEL W ROMERO

Clayton, CA 94517

THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC.

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee and Plaintiff Attorneys

LABOR COMMISIONER,STATE OF CA

1515 Clay Street Suite 801

Oakland, CA 94612

KEEPERMAN, FRED

1620 School Street Suite 107

Moraga, CA 94556

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $16,990.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 02/05/16 TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY FILED. RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $1,457.43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,451.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,374.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DATE MAILED: 09/09/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $18,070.62; Disposition: FILE RETURNED TO FILE UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,536.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,685.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2014
  • DATE MAILED: 02/25/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2012 OF MANUEL ROMERO FILED; ASSIGNED TO THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2012 OF MANUEL ROMERO FILED; ASSIGNED TO MANUEL W ROMERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2012 OF MANUEL ROMERO FILED; ASSIGNED TO LABOR COMMISSIONER,STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 04/04/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • COPY OF ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC. is a litigant