This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 22:42:11 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ VS HILL/HILL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2015 RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HILL/HILL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1110

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARBRIEL O RODRIGUEZ

Defendants

SAMANTHA MARIE HILL

SANDY HILL

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYERS, ERIC B.

Attorney At Law 940 San Pablo Avenue

Pinole, CA 94564

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2016
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY UN SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 11/18/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 11/02/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • WE CANNOT PROCESS YOUR SUBMITTED DOCUMENTS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ FILED AS TO DEFENDANT SANDY HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ AGAINST DEFENDANT SANDY HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ AGAINST DEFENDANT SAMANTHA MARIE HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ FILED AS TO DEFENDANT SAMANTHA MARIE HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ AS TO DEF ENDANT SANDY HILL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/05/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ AS TO DEF ENDANT SAMANTHA MARIE HILL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/01/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 12/11/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF GARBRIEL RODRIGUEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYERS, ERIC B.