This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 04:04:13 (UTC).

RODIRGUEZ VS. CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 07/13/2016 RODIRGUEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAMPOS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1308

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

JESUS AYALA

LUZ MENDOZA

HERMILA VERDUZCO

ANGEL VERDUZCO

REINALDO SANCHEZ ROJAS

FABIOLA RODRIGUEZ

JONATHAN VERDUZCO

CHRISTIAN VERDUZCO

JESUS VERDUZCO

RUBY S. AYALA MORA

ROSA ROMERO

JESUS AYALA JR

RODRIGO AYALA

ABRAHAM SANCHEZ MENDOZA

SILVIA AYALA

SAUL RODRIGUEZ

VANESSA GONZALEZ

LEOPOLDO RODRIGUEZ

YASMIN RODRIGUEZ

Defendant

BERTHA CAMPOS

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Other Attorney

CHAPMAN, CHRISTOPHER R

404 E. 1St Street #176

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorney

CRANE, ALISON M

601 California Street 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY REFUGIO CAMPOS, BERTHA CAMPOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TARCISIO RODRIGUEZ, ROSA ROMERO, SAUL RODRIGUEZ, LEOPOLDO RODRIGUEZ, YASMIN RODRIGUEZ, FABIOLA RODRIGUEZ, SILVIA AYALA, JESUS AYALA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS CASE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR CMC AND SERVE DEFTS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY REFUGIO CAMPOS, BERTHA CAMPOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS CASE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR CMC AND SERVE DEFTS; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: BLEDSOE, DIESTEL, TREPPA & CRANE LLP, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: REFUGIO CAMPOS, BERTHA CAMPOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF/TO FURTHER CMC AND OSC HEARING FILED BY TARCISIO RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/30/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/19/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/29/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/30/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 9/16/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less