Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 14:26:20 (UTC).

ROCK VS SALAMANCA

Case Summary

On 12/12/2012 ROCK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SALAMANCA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0494

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTESON BLOCK ROCK

Defendants

JOHN MADEROS

MARIA THERESA SALAMANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

4261 Norwalk Drive #107

San Jose, CA 95129

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2013
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY. RETURNED AS TO PLNTFS POSSESSION ONLY, W/ACCRUED COSTS, IS SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY; Disposition: WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ON 01/09/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2012 OF MATTESON ROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2012 OF MATTESON ROCK FILED AS TO DEFENDANT MARIA THERESA SALAMANCE, JOHN MADEROS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2012 OF MATTESON ROCK AGAINST DEFENDANT MARIA THERESA SALAMANCE, JOHN MADEROS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING ON DEFENDANT JOHN MADEROS FILED WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING ON DEFENDANT MARIA THERESA SALAMANCE FILED WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • RETURNED MAIL: UD NOTICE TO JOHN MADEROS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • SET FOR TRACKING UD CASE ON 1/28/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 1CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UP TO $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.