This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 16:11:03 (UTC).

ROBINSON VS. ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 ROBINSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2394

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANNON ELIZABETH ROBINSON

Defendants

ESTEFANI BARBA ALVAREZ

PATRICIA BARBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALEY, MATTHEW D.

1633 San Pablo Avenue

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

KUNG, JENNIFER A

505 14Th St Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SHANNON ELIZABETH ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: THE HALEY LAW OFFICES, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: SHANNON ELIZABETH ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ESTEFANI BARBA ALVAREZ, PATRICIA BARBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: ESTEFANI BARBA ALVAREZ, PATRICIA BARBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2016 OF SHANNON ROBINSON FILED BY ESTEFANI BARBA ALVAREZ, PATRICIA BARBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2016 OF SHANNON ROBINSON AS TO PATRICIA BARBA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 3/10/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/05/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/21/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2016 OF SHANNON ROBINSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.