This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 12:02:50 (UTC).

ROBERT E. CRAIN VS KAUSHA C. JACKSON-CRAIN

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 ROBERT E CRAIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KAUSHA C JACKSON-CRAIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2426

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERT E CRAIN

Oakland, CA 94605

Respondent

KAUSHA C JACKSON-CRAIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR RESPONSE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 05/24/2018 OF ROBERT CRAIN AS TO KAUSHA C JACKSON-CRAIN (SERVED ON 06/01/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/22/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/20/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/24/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/20/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 5/23/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLDEN ROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 05/24/2018 OF ROBERT CRAIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.