This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 02/17/2023 at 00:57:09 (UTC).

RETAIL VENTURES VS. URENA

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 RETAIL VENTURES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against URENA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Burch, Charles B. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3548

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Burch, Charles B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RETAIL VENTURES, LLC

2345 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94804

Defendants and Respondents

URENA, MIGUEL

AGUILAR, LITNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIPES, MICHAEL K

2345 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94804

 

Court Documents

Judgment Filed

06/10/2022: Judgment Filed

Abstract of Judgment Issued

06/30/2022: Abstract of Judgment Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: *Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Party; Comment: Comment ()

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: DECLARATION OF ANA HERNANDEZ FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. SIPES FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Filed; Comment: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON Complaint/Petition FILED AS TO URENA, MIGUEL -AGUILAR, LITNIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to:; Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE Complaint/Petition AGAINST DEFENDANT URENA, MIGUEL -AGUILAR, LITNIS BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Memo:; Comment: WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: MIN2: THE DEFENDANT MIGUEL URENA IS MISSING THEIR AKA. PLEASE ENSURE THE NAMES OF THE DEFENDANTS MATCH MIN2: THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT EXACTLY, AND RESUBMIT CMPAM: CORRESPONDENCE MEMORANDUM PRINTED AND MAILED THIS DATE TO THE FOLLOWING PARTY(IES): 0001 *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR MKS25/ ON 5/26/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Substituted Service of:; Comment: PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF Complaint/Petition AS TO AGUILAR, LITNIS WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 01/25/21 FILED 0000000000000000.del.+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Substituted Service of:; Comment: PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF Complaint/Petition AS TO URENA, MIGUEL WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 01/25/21 FILED 0000000000000000.del.+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCases Rescheduled Due to Assignment Change; Comment: 5CDJC3 calendared on 08/20/21 in dept. 23. Has been updated to 08/20/21 in dept. 36.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCases Rescheduled Due to Assignment Change; Comment: 5CPFC3 calendared on 02/22/21 in dept. 23. Has been updated to 02/22/21 in dept. 36.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketOriginal Summons Issued/Filed; Comment: ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON Complaint/Petition FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket*; Comment: Placed on Clerk's Tickler Calendar for 2/22/21, at 7:00 in Dept. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket*; Comment: Placed on Clerk's Tickler Calendar for 8/20/21, at 7:00 in Dept. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Comment: CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint Filed - Summons Issued; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED *FEE: 201003-0082-CK LC3/ 225.00 Paymt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less