This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 21:42:18 (UTC).

RETAIL VENTURES VS. THOMAS

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 RETAIL VENTURES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THOMAS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2865

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RETAIL VENTURES, LLC.

2345 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94804

Defendant

CHANTEL ALEJANDRA THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIPES, MICHAEL K

2345 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94804

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: WHY COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS CASE FOR PLTFS FAILU RE TO APPEAR 4/20/21 & PROSECUTE CASE; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 09/29/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK/COURT JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketWE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR CLERKS JUDGMENT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION/NOTICE RE 1033 CCP FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED RE: ATTORNEYS FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK/COURT JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2020 OF RETAIL VENTURES, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2020 OF RETAIL VENTURES, LLC. FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE: PINK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketWE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR SUMMONS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/25/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 9/11/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS NOT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RETAIL VENTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPES, MICHAEL K