This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/18/2021 at 08:26:35 (UTC).

RETAIL VENTURES VS. DOS SANTOS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 RETAIL VENTURES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOS SANTOS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4295

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RETAIL VENTURES, LLC

2345 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94804

Defendants

CLEBER DOS SANTOS

SEBASTIAO PIMENTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIPES, MICHAEL K

2345 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94804

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket5CPFC3 CALENDARED ON 03/29/21 IN DEPT. 23. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 03/29/21 IN DEPT. 36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket5CDJC3 CALENDARED ON 09/27/21 IN DEPT. 23. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 09/27/21 IN DEPT. 36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 09/29/2020 OF RETAIL VENTURES, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE: BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 3/29/21, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 9/27/21, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 23

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RETAIL VENTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPES, MICHAEL K