This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2023 at 00:57:44 (UTC).

RETAIL VENTURES VS DAVIS

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 RETAIL VENTURES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVIS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maier, Clare. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1751

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Maier, Clare

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RETAIL VENTURES, LLC

2345 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94804

Defendant and Respondent

DAVIS, ELLIOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIPES, MICHAEL K

2345 Macdonald Ave

Richmond, CA 94804

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketHearing on Order to Show Cause in Re:; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE & FAILURE TO+TIMELY PROSECUTE THIS MATTER+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: *Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment; Comment: Comment (CSADBT 08/05/2021 Civil SAD Before Trial - CDJT%%. JST 08/05/2021 CASE STATUS CHANGED TO JUDGMENT BOJ 08/05/2021 Judgment on Complaint/Petition JFP 08/05/2021 JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition FOR PLAINTIFF 10001 JAD 08/05/2021 JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition AGAINST DEFENDANT 30002 JAM 08/05/2021 PRINCIPAL $2,198.94, ATTORNEY FEES $569.89, INTEREST $2,267.73, COSTS $275.00 TJ 08/05/2021 TOTAL JUDGMENT 0002 CMPD 08/05/2021 Complaint/Petition Dispositioned)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (CCP 585d) Filed; Comment: (CCP 585(a)) CLERK`S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED CSADBT: Civil SAD Before Trial - CDJT%%. JST: CASE STATUS CHANGED TO JUDGMENT BOJ: Judgment on Complaint/Petition JFP: JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition FOR PLAINTIFF 10001 JAD: JUDGMENT ON THE Complaint/Petition AGAINST DEFENDANT 30002 JAM: PRINCIPAL $2,198.94, ATTORNEY FEES $569.89, INTEREST $2,267.73, COSTS $275.00 TJ: TOTAL JUDGMENT 0002 CMPD: Complaint/Petition Dispositioned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. SIPES FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk/Court Judgment Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR CLERK/COURT JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket*; Comment: DECLARATION 585 FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Memo:; Comment: CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: LETTER RE INTENT FOR COLLECTION MIN2: THE COURT CANNOT FILE A LETTER. YOU MAY SUBMIT IT ATTACHED TO A PROPERLY FORMATTED COURT DOCUMENT MIN2: TO BE FILED. THANK YOU. CMPAM: CORRESPONDENCE MEMORANDUM PRINTED AND MAILED THIS DATE TO THE FOLLOWING PARTY(IES): 0001 *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR MKS25/ ON 7/12/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketHearing on Order to Show Cause in Re:; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE & FAILURE TO+TIMELY PROSECUTE THIS MATTER+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Memo:; Comment: WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR CLERKS JUDGMENT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: MIN2: DECLARATION C.C.P. 1033 IS REQUIRED WHEN FILING FOR A CLERKS JUDGMENT. CMPAM: CORRESPONDENCE MEMORANDUM PRINTED AND MAILED THIS DATE TO THE FOLLOWING PARTY(IES): 0001 *NOT: NOTICE PRINTED FOR MKS25/ ON 6/21/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Comment: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED RE: ATTORNEYS FEES %%X%% %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketHearing on Order to Show Cause in Re:; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Continued; Comment: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE & FAILURE TO+TIMELY PROSECUTE THIS MATTER+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Substituted Service of:; Comment: PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF Complaint/Petition AS TO DAVIS, ELLIOT WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 04/02/21 FILED 0000000000000000.del.+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDefault Department Changed To:; Comment: DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCases Rescheduled Due to Assignment Change; Comment: 5CDJC3 calendared on 03/08/21 in dept. 23. Has been updated to 03/08/21 in dept. 36.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued/Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE Complaint/Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docket*; Comment: Placed on Clerk's Tickler Calendar for 9/08/20, at 7:00 in Dept. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docket*; Comment: Placed on Clerk's Tickler Calendar for 3/08/21, at 7:00 in Dept. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketOriginal Summons Issued/Filed; Comment: ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON Complaint/Petition FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Comment: CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint Filed - Summons Issued; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS NOT ISSUED 200311-0149-CK LC3/ 225.00 Paymt Operator Code: JSCHW *FEE: 200311-0149-CK LC3/ 225.00 Paymt *REFNM: 200311-0149-CK Reference Number 011748 CM: PRAYER AMOUNT IS $2198.94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less