This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 04:36:58 (UTC).

RETAIL VENTURES VS DANIELS

Case Summary

On 04/07/2015 RETAIL VENTURES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIELS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0173

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RETAIL VENTURES LLC

2345 Macdonald Ave,

Richmond, CA 94804

Defendant

LAKEISHA DANIELS

Richmond, CA 94804

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $951.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN AMOUNT OF $141.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN AMOUNT OF $99.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketMEMO OF COSTS ACCRUED MAILED ON 06/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 06/03/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 06/03/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 05/29/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 04/07/2015 OF RETAIL VENTURES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT LAKEISHA DANIELS FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 05/13/15. FEE FOR SERVICE $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Docket2SCT CALENDARED ON 05/29/15 IN DEPT. 57. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 05/29/15 IN DEPT. 54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 5/29/15 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketAMOUNT OF CLAIM $551.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (MORE THAN 12 CLAIMS FILED WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RETAIL VENTURES LLC is a litigant