This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 10/23/2022 at 21:03:48 (UTC).

Retail Ventures, LLC vs. Hernandez/Hunil

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Retail Ventures, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hernandez/Hunil. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Young, Ayana and Ribas, Tamara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0120

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judges

Young, Ayana

Ribas, Tamara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Retail Ventures, LLC

Palace Furniture

Defendants and Respondents

Hernandez, David

Hunil, Maria Isabel

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant Filed

04/22/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant Filed

Request for Certified Mail

05/12/2022: Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail

05/12/2022: Request for Certified Mail

scan0072.pdf

08/09/2022: scan0072.pdf

scan0073.pdf

08/09/2022: scan0073.pdf

Minutes w/Appearances

08/26/2022: Minutes w/Appearances

Authorization to Appear Filed

08/26/2022: Authorization to Appear Filed

Stipulation for Appointment of Temporary Judge Filed

08/26/2022: Stipulation for Appointment of Temporary Judge Filed

Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types

01/06/2023: Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types

Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types

01/06/2023: Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types

Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types

01/06/2023: Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial; Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types; Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types; Hearing Notice - All Hearing Types; Judicial Officer: Young, Ayana; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Appointment of Temporary Judge Filed; Judicial Officer: Ribas, Tamara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial; Minutes w/Appearances; Judicial Officer: Ribas, Tamara; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Continued; Parties Present; Plaintiff/Petitioner: Retail Ventures, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: SC-100: Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService Questionable; scan0072.pdf; Comment: Substitute Service for David Hernandez - Did not provide name or description of the person server gave papers to.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Certified Mail; Comment: 70121010000329603799

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Certified Mail; Comment: 70121010000329603812

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Cause Of ActionComplaint; Type: Action; Description: Initial Complaint Filed; Remedy: Monetary Damages; Amount: $1643.24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Complaint; File Date: 04/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketService of Complaint; Requested By: Retail Ventures, LLC; Unserved; Served: 07/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketClaim and Order to Plaintiff for Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAmount of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less