Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 10/03/2018 at 00:01:51 (UTC).

RENWICK VS SEECON FINANCIAL

Case Summary

On 03/25/2014 RENWICK filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SEECON FINANCIAL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1145

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPH BROWN

NAVMEET DEV

SOFANIT TESFAI

ROBERT WILKES JR

GUSTAVO ELIAS

RICARDO NUNEZ

LAURENCE RUSSELL

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION

ACE LATHING,INC.

DEPENDABLE SHEET METAL

MASTER DRYWALL INC.

J. REDFERN, INC.

GDH ENTERPRISES

ELLISON FRAMING, INC.

DESILVA GATES CONSTRUCTION, L.P.

MWB BUILDING CONTRACTORS, INC.

POES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

ZOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

JSA GENERAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

CALLAWAY SECURITY & FIRE INC.

113 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASDAN, KENNETH S

1990 N. California Blvd Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KENNEDY, MICHAEL T

100 Pringle Avenue Ste.700

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DAY, MATTHEW R

350 University Ave., Ste.200

Sacramento, CA 95825

LIFTER, JILL J

2000 Crow Canyon Place Suite 400

San Ramon, CA 94583-1367

NAKAGAWA, EDWIN S

1655 Grant Street, Ste 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

SANDERS, BRIAN M

2300 Clayton Road Suite 350

Concord, CA 94520

ARABI, ARASH S

18100 Von Karman Avenue Suite 750

Irvine, CA 92612

MARDEN, STEVEN M

3900 Newpark Mall Road Suite 331

Newark, CA 94560

RESURRECCION, TREVOR O

23212 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

SAWYER, GEOFFREY T.

23212 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Other Attorneys

MCELROY, JULIE D

2401 American River Drive Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

HERP, PAUL A

525 Mark Street Suite 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

CRONIN-PRATHER, RYAN J

350 University Ave. Ste.200

Sacramento, CA 95825

SAMONI, PAUL V

215 Lennon Lane Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

GILL, SUSAN J

1660 Union St, Suite 301

San Diego, CA 92121

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MOKRI, NAMVAR A

4695 Macarthur Court Suite 350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

VAN DE POEL, JOHN F

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

RODMAN, JORDAN A.

3558 Round Barn Blvd. Suite 201

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P

201 North Civic Drive Suite 145

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

2 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • SIGNED STIP AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • SIGNED STIP AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE THE COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. BENJAMIN KOEGEL SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR SEECON FINANCIAL &CONST CO., INC. AND IS REPLACED BY CHRISTIAN P LUCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY BY SEECON FINANCIAL (IMAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. BENJAMIN KOEGEL SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR DISCOVERY BUILDERS,INC. AND IS REPLACED BY CHRISTIAN P LUCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
1,123 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2012
  • DISCOVERY BUILDERS,INC. ADDED AS A DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • ANTIONETTE RENWICK, ELIZABETH A AKEYO, CRAIG CEDERGREN, PREM P CHAUDRI, RIPU D CHAUDRI, MICHELLE COSTEIU, GURJIT K DEV, NAVMEET DEV, GUSTAVO ELIAS, MARTHA ELIAS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 8/21/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/29/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2012 OF J RENWICK PAID BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2012 OF J RENWICK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASTER DRYWALL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GDH ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases where J. REDFERN, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ELLISON FRAMING, INC. is a litigant