Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 11:45:08 (UTC).

RENEE PALMER VS. 99 CENTS ONLY STORE

Case Summary

On 01/12/2012 RENEE PALMER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0083

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENEE PALMER

Defendants

ARES MANAGEMENT LLC.

99 CENTS ONLY STORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED, MICHAEL J.

60 Creektree Lane

Alamo, CA 94507

Defendant Attorney

FORSTER, KATHERINE M

355 South Grand Ave, 35 Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • STIPULATION & ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • SIGNED STIP/ORDER TO STAY CASE TO 103 TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY 99 CENTS ONLY STORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RENEE PALMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • (U.J.) FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY 99 CENTS ONLY STORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2012
  • ORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO RENEE PALMER IS DENIED; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING WAS SET FOR 2/17/12 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • SIGNED ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER SENT TO ROOM 103 FOR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/19/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/31/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/12/2012 OF RENEE PALMER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 CENTS ONLY STORES is a litigant

Latest cases where ARES MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Michael James