This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/15/2017 at 15:05:41 (UTC).

RENAISSANCE I VS. SHAPELL INDUSTRIES INC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2014 RENAISSANCE I filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHAPELL INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2230

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENAISSANCE I HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SHAPELL INDUSTRIESINC

SHAPELL INDUSTRIESOF NORTHERNCALIFORNIA

SHAPELL HOMES

Cross Defendants

ABCO HEATING & AIRCONDITIONING INC

ENGEO INCORPORATED

RIVERA COMPANY INC

PADILLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

SIERRA PRECAST CONCRETE,INC.

PACIFIC RIM PLUMBING INC

PETERSEN-DEAN INC

SACRAMENTO A-1 DOOR

MURGA, STRANGE & CHALMERS, INC

COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC

SAN MARINO PLASTERING INC

PRESTON PIPELINES INC

BOB FAIX PLUMBING

J. REDFERN INC

SIERRA PRECAST INC

ATLANTIC CONCRETE INC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERDING, TYLER P

2175 North California Blvd Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CAPPELLUTI, LISA M.

150 Post St, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Cross Defendant Attorneys

KAHN, ROBERT J.

2033 North Main Street Suite 363

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

HOME, W. STUART

1655 Grant Street, Ste.800-B.

Concord, CA 94520

WARD, DENNIS J.

50 W, San Fernando St Suite 1400

San Jose, CA 95113

PARK, DAVID S

39300 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

JACOBSEN, KAREN L

2401 American River Drive Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

SHAMBAUGH, CYNTHIA

525 Market Street Suite 2850

San Francisco, CA 94105

D'ANDREA, MICHAEL A

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Other Attorneys

ROSENFELD, MARIA S

7801 Folsom Blvd Suite 325

Sacramento, CA 95826

WELCH, STEPHEN B

P.O. Box 8035 2033 N. Main Street #800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL OR SETTLEMENT COMPLAINCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY SHAPELL INDUSTRIESINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY RENAISSANCE I HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 30 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
275 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF RENAISSANCE I HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFT(S) SHAPELL INDUSTRIESINC, SIGNED ON 11/04/13 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF RENAISSANCE I HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION FILED TO NAME SHAPELL INDUSTRIESOF NORTHERNCALIFORNIA, SHAPELL HOMES AS DOE 1 AND 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF RENAISSANCE I HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION FILED BY SHAPELL INDUSTRIESINC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/13/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/30/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF RENAISSANCE I HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.