This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 05:46:04 (UTC).

RANAE GARABEDIAN VS EDWARD BURKE

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 RANAE GARABEDIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDWARD BURKE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0325

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANAE GARABEDIAN

Richmond, CA 94801

Defendant

EDWARD (NED) BURKE

Portland, OR 97201

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2018
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 03/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 03/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/30/2016 OF RANAE GARABEDIAN EDWARD (NED) BURKE IS QUESTIONABLE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: RETURNED (MAILED BY PARTY INSTEAD OF CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RENAE GARABEDIAN FILED RE: DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: PER COURT ORDER/SC100 ON 12/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 9/07/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less