This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 16:21:02 (UTC).

RADY VS DANG

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 RADY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DANG. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2403

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAHINAZ ABOURAYA

HOMAM RADY

Defendants

DMD II INCORPORATED

CHERI AMANDA DANG,D.D.S

VINCENT DOAN VAN, D.D.S.

DENTABLISS DENTAL

CHERI A DANG

CHERI A. DANG, DMDII INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSE, VALERIE N

650 California Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

CURLEY, ARTHUR W.

1100 Larkspur Landing Circle Suite 200

Larkspur, CA 94939

PICCHI, JOSEPH S.

2300 Contra Costa Blvd, Suite 350

Pleasant Hilll, CA 94523-2398

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ARTHUR W CURLEY, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: CHERI A. DANG, DMDII INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HOMAM RADY, SHAHINAZ ABOURAYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: GALLOWAY, LUCCHESE, EVERSON & PICCHI, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: VINCENT DOAN VAN, D.D.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY VINCENT DOAN VAN, D.D.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHERI AMANDA DANG,D.D.S, CHERI A. DANG, DMDII INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2016 OF HOMAM RADY FILED BY CHERI AMANDA DANG,D.D.S, CHERI A. DANG, DMDII INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: NORCAL COURIER & LEGAL, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: HOMAM RADY, SHAHINAZ ABOURAYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2016 OF HOMAM RADY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/09/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/23/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2016 OF HOMAM RADY, DMD II INCORPORATED IS REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE SPELLING OF PARTY CHERI A. DANG, DMDII INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.