This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 20:51:15 (UTC).

QUIGLEY VS. MERSON [COMPLEX]

Case Summary

On 09/13/2016 QUIGLEY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MERSON COMPLEX. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1753

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALICE M QUIGLEY

Martinez, CA 94553

Defendants

MUIR ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, A MEDICAL GRO

JOHN K MERSON MD

JOHN MUIR HEALTH

EAST BAY SPORTS MEDICINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC

STEVEN TATOM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2016 OF ALICE QUIGLEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 12/02/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/28/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/13/2016 OF ALICE QUIGLEY PAID BY ALICE M QUIGLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUIR ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, A MEDICAL GRO is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHN MUIR HEALTH is a litigant