This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 11:43:10 (UTC).

QUEVEDO VS MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 QUEVEDO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MITCHELL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0491

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

ALFONSO QUEVEDO

Richmond, CA 94801

Defendant and Appellant

BRITTANY NICOLE MITCHELL

Richmond, CA 94806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 09/16/2015 OF ALFONSO QUEVEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0004 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF ALFONSO QUEVEDO FILED RE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • UPDATE PARTY CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 09/16/2015 OF ALFONSO QUEVEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL FROM SUPERIOR COURT ENTERED ON 02/26/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CASE RETURNED FROM APPEAL STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS - TRIAL DE NOVO (20 MINUTES); Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS - TRIAL DE NOVO WAS SET FOR 2/26/16 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FROM THE JUDGMENT FILED BY CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 09/16/2015 OF ALFONSO QUEVEDO BRITTANY NICOLE MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • THE COURT NOW RULES ON THE MOTION TO VACATE HEARD ON 01/13/16. THE MOTION IS DENIED. YOU HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE MAILING OF THIS NOTICE TO FILE AN APPEAL OF THE DENIAL OF THE MOTION TO VACATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 10/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 10/16/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 09/16/2015 OF ALFONSO QUEVEDO AS TO DEFENDANT BRITTANY NICOLE MITCHELL FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 09/16/15. FEE FOR SERVICE $10.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/16/15 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $9,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less